LA HB228 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to restroom access for individuals with certain conditions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to restroom access for individuals with certain conditions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 228 FINAL PASSAGE (#809) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 228 FINAL PASSAGE (#573) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-22HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-22HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 444.
2021-06-09HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-06-06SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-03SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-02SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-05-20SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-19HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-19HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2021.
2021-05-18HouseNotice given.
2021-05-18HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021.
2021-05-13HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-12HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-03-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021.
2021-03-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-03-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback