LA HB222 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to qualifications for and enforcement of certificates of certified public accountants
Title
Provides relative to qualifications for and enforcement of certificates of certified public accountants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 222 ADOPT (#1003) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 222 MOTION TO ADOPT (#883) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 222 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#600) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 222 FINAL PASSAGE (#508) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 222 FINAL PASSAGE (#89) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 222 MOTION TO ADOPT (#883) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 222 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#600) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 222 FINAL PASSAGE (#508) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 222 FINAL PASSAGE (#89) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-06-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 188. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2013. |
2013-06-02 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2013-05-29 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Martiny, Peacock, and Murray. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2013-05-28 | House | House conferees appointed: Tim Burns, Ponti, and Stokes. |
2013-05-28 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2013-05-23 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 5/28/2013. |
2013-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-04-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-22 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-04-22 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-04-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/22/2013. |
2013-04-17 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. |
2013-04-16 | House | Reported favorably (15-0) (Local and Consent). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2013-03-25 | House | Prefiled. |