LA HB222 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the garnishment of income for child support (EN FF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the garnishment of income for child support (EN FF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Vote on HB 222, FINAL PASSAGE (#1172) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 222, FINAL PASSAGE (#798) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 222, AMENDMENT B-80, MOTION TO ADOPT (#424) (Y: 25 N: 50 NV: 28 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-21 Effective date: August 15, 2010.
2010-06-21 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 358.
2010-06-11 Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
2010-06-10 Signed by the President of the Senate.
2010-06-09 Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2010-06-09 Received from the Senate without amendments.
2010-06-09 Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2010-05-27 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2010-05-26 Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2010-05-25 Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
2010-05-17 Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2010-05-13 Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2010-05-12 Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2010-05-12 Called from the calendar.
2010-05-05 Scheduled for floor debate on May 12, 2010.
2010-05-05 Notice given.
2010-04-27 Read by title, returned to the calendar.
2010-04-19 Scheduled for floor debate on April 27, 2010.
2010-04-19 Notice given.
2010-04-19 Read by title, returned to the calendar.
2010-04-15 Scheduled for floor debate on April 19, 2010.
2010-04-13 Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2010-04-12 Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular).
2010-03-29 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2010-03-12 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010.
2010-03-09 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2010-03-09 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback