LA HB22 | 2022 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Read third time by title, amended, by a vote of 53 yeas, 43 nays, the entire subject matter was tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Read third time by title, amended, by a vote of 53 yeas, 43 nays, the entire subject matter was tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the redistricting of the supreme court (Item #6)
Title
Provides for the redistricting of the supreme court (Item #6)
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Vote on HB 22 TABLE SUBJECT MATTER (#38) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, by a vote of 53 yeas, 43 nays, the entire subject matter was tabled. |
2022-02-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/16/2022. |
2022-02-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-02-14 | House | Reported with amendments (10-7). |
2022-02-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-02-10 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |