LA HB215 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the death penalty for offenses committed on or after August 1, 2019 (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Eliminates the death penalty for offenses committed on or after August 1, 2019 (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Notice removed |
2019-05-23 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-23 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19. |
2019-05-22 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19. |
2019-05-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably (8-7). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |