LA HB214 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to parental involvement in public schools
Title
Provides relative to parental involvement in public schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 214 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#820) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 214 FINAL PASSAGE (#867) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 214 FINAL PASSAGE (#358) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 214 FINAL PASSAGE (#867) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 214 FINAL PASSAGE (#358) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 306. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/04/2013. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-13 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2013. |
2013-05-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported favorably (13-0) (Local and Consent). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-03-25 | House | Prefiled. |