LA HB209 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/19.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes a sales and use tax exemption for new automobiles, aircraft, boats, vessels or other water craft used as demonstrators (EG -$170,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes a sales and use tax exemption for new automobiles, aircraft, boats, vessels or other water craft used as demonstrators (EG -$170,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/23/19.
2019-04-17HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably (17-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback