LA HB207 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes penalties associated with minors swimming in certain waterways without personal flotation devices (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Establishes penalties associated with minors swimming in certain waterways without personal flotation devices (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 207 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1061) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 207 FINAL PASSAGE (#805) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 207 FINAL PASSAGE (#596) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 207 FINAL PASSAGE (#805) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 207 FINAL PASSAGE (#596) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2023. |
2023-06-13 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 300. |
2023-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2023-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023. |
2023-06-05 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2023. |
2023-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0-1). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2023-03-24 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/24/2023. |
2023-03-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2023-03-24 | House | Prefiled. |