LA HB206 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for the rates and brackets for purposes of calculating income taxes and eliminates the mandatory income tax deduction for federal income taxes paid for purposes of computing income taxes
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for the rates and brackets for purposes of calculating income taxes and eliminates the mandatory income tax deduction for federal income taxes paid for purposes of computing income taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-03-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. |
2021-03-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-03-25 | House | Prefiled. |