LA HB200 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Effective date: 06/11/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Effective date: 06/11/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts military survivor benefit plan payments from state individual income tax (EN -$1,500,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Exempts military survivor benefit plan payments from state individual income tax (EN -$1,500,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 200 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#887) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 200 FINAL PASSAGE (#528) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 200 FINAL PASSAGE (#273) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 200 FINAL PASSAGE (#528) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 200 FINAL PASSAGE (#273) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | House | Effective date: 06/11/2021. |
2021-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 185. |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2021-05-27 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/01/2021. |
2021-05-26 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-05 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-05 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021. |
2021-05-04 | House | Notice given. |
2021-04-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2021. |
2021-04-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-03-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. |
2021-03-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-03-24 | House | Prefiled. |