LA HB20 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Scheduled for floor debate on 06/10/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the use of private funds to pay election-related expenses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the use of private funds to pay election-related expenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 20 FINAL PASSAGE (#434) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 20 AMENDMENT # 2430 BY PRICE ADOPT (#433) (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 20 FINAL PASSAGE (#186) (Y: 69 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/10/2021.
2021-06-08SenateVeto message from the Governor received and read.
2021-06-08HouseVeto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
2021-06-07HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2021-05-26HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-05-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-05-24HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-20HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-05-20SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-17SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-13SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-12SenateReported favorably.
2021-05-06SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2021-05-05SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-04HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 35. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
2021-04-28HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-27HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-02-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2021.
2021-02-22HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-02-19HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB20&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1200134
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217966
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227020
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217289
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217943
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226899
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1200137
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218153
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233248
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237273
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220651
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226973
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226974

Bill Comments

feedback