LA HB20 | 2016 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Effective date: 06/28/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the apportionment ratio for purposes of computing corporate income tax and provides for the sourcing of sales (Item #44) (EN INCREASE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the apportionment ratio for purposes of computing corporate income tax and provides for the sourcing of sales (Item #44) (EN INCREASE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 20 FINAL PASSAGE (#68) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 20 AMENDMENT # 152 BY MORRIS JIM MOTION TO ADOPT (#12) (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 20 FINAL PASSAGE (#13) (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-28HouseEffective date: 06/28/2016.
2016-06-28HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 8.
2016-06-22HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2016-06-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2016-06-22HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2016-06-22HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2016-06-21SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2016-06-21SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2016-06-16SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2016-06-15SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-06-15SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2016-06-14SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2016-06-13SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2016-06-09HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 38. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2016-06-08HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/09/2016.
2016-06-08HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-06-08HouseRules suspended.
2016-06-08HouseReported favorably (10-6).
2016-06-06HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2016-06-05HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2016-06-05HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=162ES&b=HB20&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1009935
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011208
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011384
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1013103
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1014296
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011244
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011301
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011374
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1012727
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1009953
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011100
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011238
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011256
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011387
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011745
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1014080
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1017234
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011373
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1013045

Bill Comments

feedback