LA HB199 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-16)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for the State and Local Streamlined Sales and Use Tax Commission (EN SEE FISC NOTE See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for the State and Local Streamlined Sales and Use Tax Commission (EN SEE FISC NOTE See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 199 ADOPT (#777) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 199 MOTION TO ADOPT (#955) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 199 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#471) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 199 CO-AUTHORS (#346) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 199 FINAL PASSAGE (#345) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Vote on HB 199 FINAL PASSAGE (#44) (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Vote on HB 199 AMENDMENT # 1478 BY MIGUEZ MOTION TO ADOPT (#43) (Y: 18 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14HouseEffective date: See Act.
2021-06-14HouseBecomes Act No. 131.
2021-06-10HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-03HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-03SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-06-03SenateRules suspended.
2021-06-03SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-03HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2021-06-03HouseRules suspended.
2021-06-03HouseConference Committee report received.
2021-06-03SenateConference committee report received.
2021-05-18HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2021-05-18SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Cortez, Milligan, and Allain.
2021-05-18SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2021-05-17HouseHouse conferees appointed: Schexnayder, Bishop, and Beaullieu.
2021-05-17SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2021-05-17HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Senate amendments, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were rejected. Conference committee appointment pending.
2021-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2021.
2021-05-12HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-05-12SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-11SenateRead by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 05/12/21.
2021-05-05SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-04SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-03SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-27SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2021-04-26SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-04-21HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 4. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-21HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-04-21HouseRead by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
2021-04-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/21/2021.
2021-04-20HouseRead by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-20HouseReported without amendments (13-0-1).
2021-04-14HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-04-13HouseReported favorably (14-1). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-03-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021.
2021-03-24HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-03-24HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB199&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1206450
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213542
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216267
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231625
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235042
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213745
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216148
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219797
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219760
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219742
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219726
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219471
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220845
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224001
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1206451
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213410
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213695
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215168
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216288
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219555
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219836
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220409
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225195
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224271
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231404
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236022
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1239044
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216195
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216204
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224054
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224055
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225298
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231447
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231514

Bill Comments 750

feedback