LA HB195 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-05 - By a vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-05 - By a vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public schools to provide free menstrual products in easily accessible locations (EG INCREASE LF EX See Note) (RE INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Requires public schools to provide free menstrual products in easily accessible locations (EG INCREASE LF EX See Note) (RE INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Aimee Freeman [D] | Rep. Delisha Boyd [D] | Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R] | Rep. Jason Hughes [D] |
Rep. Mandie Landry [D] | Rep. Pat Moore [D] | Rep. Candace Newell [D] | Rep. Denise Marcelle [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 195 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1513) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 195 FINAL PASSAGE (#663) (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 195 FINAL PASSAGE (#663) (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-05 | House | By a vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-05 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2022. |
2022-04-28 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-27 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-02-25 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/25/2022. |
2022-02-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-02-25 | House | Prefiled. |