LA HB192 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Effective date: 01/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Effective date: 01/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the unemployment compensation procedure to be applied by the administrator for 2023 calendar year (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides for the unemployment compensation procedure to be applied by the administrator for 2023 calendar year (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 192 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1020) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 192 FINAL PASSAGE (#710) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 192 FINAL PASSAGE (#335) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 192 FINAL PASSAGE (#335) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 192 FINAL PASSAGE (#710) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 192 FINAL PASSAGE (#335) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 192 FINAL PASSAGE (#335) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Effective date: 01/01/2023. |
2022-05-26 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 116. |
2022-05-24 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-23 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-05-18 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/19/2022. |
2022-05-18 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-19 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2022. |
2022-04-11 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2022-02-25 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/25/2022. |
2022-02-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2022-02-25 | House | Prefiled. |