LA HB192 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes credit card payment to manufacturers and wholesale dealers of alcoholic beverages
Title
Authorizes credit card payment to manufacturers and wholesale dealers of alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 192 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1151) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 192 FINAL PASSAGE (#497) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 192 FINAL PASSAGE (#303) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 192 FINAL PASSAGE (#497) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 192 FINAL PASSAGE (#303) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2021. |
2021-06-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 278. |
2021-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-08 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2021-06-08 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021. |
2021-06-07 | House | Notice given. |
2021-06-01 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-27 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/01/2021. |
2021-05-26 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021. |
2021-05-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2021-03-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. |
2021-03-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2021-03-24 | House | Prefiled. |