LA HB186 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Effective date: 01/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Effective date: 01/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to health insurance coverage for standard fertility preservation services (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to health insurance coverage for standard fertility preservation services (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 186 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1211) (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 186 ADOPT (#1002) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 186 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1023) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 186 FINAL PASSAGE (#610) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 186 FINAL PASSAGE (#485) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 186 ADOPT (#1002) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 186 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1023) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 186 FINAL PASSAGE (#610) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 186 FINAL PASSAGE (#485) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | House | Effective date: 01/01/2024. |
2023-06-13 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 299. |
2023-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2023-06-08 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2023-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 88, nays 4. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2023-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2023-06-08 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2023-06-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Davis, Huval, and Hughes. |
2023-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Talbot, Smith, and Jackson. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2023-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2023-06-04 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023. |
2023-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2023. |
2023-05-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported with amendments (19-0). |
2023-04-27 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2023-03-24 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/24/2023. |
2023-03-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2023-03-24 | House | Prefiled. |