LA HB182 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for pay equality regardless of gender (OR SEE FISC NOTE)
Title
Provides for pay equality regardless of gender (OR SEE FISC NOTE)
Sponsors
Rep. Kenny Cox [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2015-03-27 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/27/2015. |
2015-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2015-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |