LA HB180 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Becomes HB 712.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Becomes HB 712.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to unemployment compensation requirements (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to unemployment compensation requirements (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | Becomes HB 712. |
2021-06-03 | House | Reported by substitute (10-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2021-03-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. |
2021-03-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2021-03-23 | House | Prefiled. |