LA HB178 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for venue for actions involving certain insurers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for venue for actions involving certain insurers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-02HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2023-05-02HouseCalled from the calendar.
2023-04-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2023.
2023-04-26HouseNotice given.
2023-04-26HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2023-04-26HouseCalled from the calendar.
2023-04-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2023.
2023-04-24HouseNotice given.
2023-04-24HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2023-04-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2023.
2023-04-20HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2023-04-19HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2023-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2023-03-24HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/24/2023.
2023-03-24HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2023-03-24HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback