LA HB178 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Effective date: 08/01/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the suspension or deferral of sentence and probation in felony cases (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the suspension or deferral of sentence and probation in felony cases (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 178 FINAL PASSAGE (#410) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 178 FINAL PASSAGE (#151) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-05HouseEffective date: 08/01/20.
2020-06-05HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 70.
2020-06-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-05-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-28HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-28HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-05-27SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-26SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-26SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-02-24HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020.
2020-02-24HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-02-24HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB178&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1158636
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169888
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176742
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180285
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169499
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1165579
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169759
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1158671
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168738
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169904
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171356
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177169
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185698
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173152
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176609

Bill Comments

feedback