LA HB176 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 07/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires students who are entering eleventh grade or who are 16 and entering any grade to provide satisfactory evidence of current immunization against meningococcal disease as a condition of school entry (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires students who are entering eleventh grade or who are 16 and entering any grade to provide satisfactory evidence of current immunization against meningococcal disease as a condition of school entry (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 176 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#801) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 176 FINAL PASSAGE (#666) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Vote on HB 176 FINAL PASSAGE (#58) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseEffective date: 07/01/2019.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 196.
2018-05-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-09HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-08HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/08/18.
2018-05-01HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-01SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-23SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-19SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-18SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2018-03-21SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-03-20SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-03-20HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/20/18.
2018-03-15HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-14HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-02-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-02-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB176&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1067819
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074998
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094597
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099052
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074480
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074966
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088052
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089342
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089493
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088831
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092405
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092550
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094364
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1067828
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074760
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075219
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075275
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088165
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098738
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1107238
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077032
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092183

Bill Comments

feedback