LA HB176 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Becomes HB 1155.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes persons obtaining a protective order to carry a concealed handgun without a permit for a limited period of time (OR INCREASE SD RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes persons obtaining a protective order to carry a concealed handgun without a permit for a limited period of time (OR INCREASE SD RV See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseBecomes HB 1155.
2016-05-03HouseReported by substitute (12-0).
2016-03-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2016-02-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2016.
2016-02-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2016-02-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback