LA HB172 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the cancellation of inferior privileges, liens, and mortgages
Title
Provides relative to the cancellation of inferior privileges, liens, and mortgages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 172 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1133) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 172 FINAL PASSAGE (#929) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 172 FINAL PASSAGE (#568) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 172 FINAL PASSAGE (#568) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 172 FINAL PASSAGE (#929) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 172 FINAL PASSAGE (#568) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 172 FINAL PASSAGE (#568) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 452. |
2018-05-17 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-15 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/15/18. |
2018-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/18. |
2018-04-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported with amendments (6-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |