LA HB17 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Effective date: 6/12/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Effective date: 6/12/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides criteria for the definition of "dealer" for purposes of the sales tax imposed on transactions involving a remote seller (Item #26) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides criteria for the definition of "dealer" for purposes of the sales tax imposed on transactions involving a remote seller (Item #26) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 17 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#71) (Y: 96 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 17 FINAL PASSAGE (#87) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 17 FINAL PASSAGE (#52) (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 17 FINAL PASSAGE (#87) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 17 FINAL PASSAGE (#52) (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Effective date: 6/12/2018. |
2018-06-12 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 5. |
2018-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 7, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-06-04 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2018-05-31 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-31 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-28 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/18. |
2018-05-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-25 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2018-05-24 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-05-24 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-05-22 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-05-22 | House | Prefiled. |