LA HB17 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates funds for payment of judgment against DOTD in "Anna Belle Stein Ockman, et al v Custom Bus Charter, Inc., et al " consolidated with "Leila Marie Tassin, et al v. Frank Bedell, et al"
Title
Appropriates funds for payment of judgment against DOTD in "Anna Belle Stein Ockman, et al v Custom Bus Charter, Inc., et al " consolidated with "Leila Marie Tassin, et al v. Frank Bedell, et al"
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-03-11 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/11/2011. | |
2011-03-10 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-03-10 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=11RS&billid=HB17 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=732055 |