LA HB167 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Becomes HB 618.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Becomes HB 618.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements for certification, hiring, and dismissal of teachers and other school employees with respect to criminal history
Title
Revises requirements for certification, hiring, and dismissal of teachers and other school employees with respect to criminal history
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Becomes HB 618. |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported by substitute (13-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-03-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-03-26 | House | Prefiled. |