LA HB165 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits employees of the La. Fire and Emergency Training Institute to drive vehicles without a commercial driver's license (CDL) in the course and scope of their employment
Title
Permits employees of the La. Fire and Emergency Training Institute to drive vehicles without a commercial driver's license (CDL) in the course and scope of their employment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House. |
2013-05-20 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-14 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported by substitute (13-0) (Regular) |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2013-03-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2013. |
2013-03-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2013-03-20 | House | Prefiled. |