LA HB163 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Medicaid Recipient Fraud Unit within the office of the attorney general (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Medicaid Recipient Fraud Unit within the office of the attorney general (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 163 FINAL PASSAGE (#646) (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 24. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/18. |
2018-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-24 | House | Reported with amendments (13-2). |
2018-04-06 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported favorably (11-3). |
2018-03-28 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-03-28 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |