LA HB16 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Becomes HB 612.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Becomes HB 612.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a physical exam that meets or exceeds national standards for purposes of membership in the Firefighters' Retirement System (OR DECREASE APV)
Title
Requires a physical exam that meets or exceeds national standards for purposes of membership in the Firefighters' Retirement System (OR DECREASE APV)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Becomes HB 612. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported by substitute (6-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2019-02-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2019. |
2019-02-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2019-02-20 | House | Prefiled. |