LA HB158 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a renewable tax for the operation of the coroner's office for certain parishes
Title
Authorizes a renewable tax for the operation of the coroner's office for certain parishes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Withdrawn from the files of the House. |
2022-04-04 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Judiciary. |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2022-02-25 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/25/2022. |
2022-02-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2022-02-24 | House | Prefiled. |