LA HB158 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-29 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-29 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the recommendation of medical marijuana in treating certain neurodegenerative diseases and conditions
Title
Authorizes the recommendation of medical marijuana in treating certain neurodegenerative diseases and conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 158 FINAL PASSAGE (#244) (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-29 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 10. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-02-24 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020. |
2020-02-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-02-24 | House | Prefiled. |