LA HB157 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the financial security of surviving spouses and children of certain firemen and law enforcement officers who suffer death by heart attack or stroke (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the financial security of surviving spouses and children of certain firemen and law enforcement officers who suffer death by heart attack or stroke (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Green [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 157 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1093) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 157 FINAL PASSAGE (#920) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 157 FINAL PASSAGE (#332) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 157 FINAL PASSAGE (#920) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 157 FINAL PASSAGE (#332) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2021. |
2021-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 171. |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-08 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2021-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021. |
2021-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021. |
2021-05-04 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-04 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-05-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2021-03-19 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2021. |
2021-03-19 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2021-03-19 | House | Prefiled. |