LA HB156 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to regulations for the construction, design, equipment, and operation of school buses
Title
Provides relative to regulations for the construction, design, equipment, and operation of school buses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 156 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1024) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 156 ADOPT (#1010) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 156 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#876) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 156 FINAL PASSAGE (#746) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 156 FINAL PASSAGE (#304) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 156 ADOPT (#1010) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 156 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#876) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 156 FINAL PASSAGE (#746) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 156 FINAL PASSAGE (#304) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2019. |
2019-06-20 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 377. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2019-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/19. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays. |
2019-06-05 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2019-06-04 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrish, White, and Mizell. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2019-06-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Pugh, Nancy Landry, and Berthelot. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2019-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19. |
2019-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-14 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-14 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19. |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-03-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-03-25 | House | Prefiled. |