LA HB15 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to emergency declarations (Items #1, #2, and #28)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to emergency declarations (Items #1, #2, and #28)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-02 - House - House Vote on HB 15 FINAL PASSAGE (#23) (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-05SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2020-10-02HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 27. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-01HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/02/20.
2020-10-01HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-01HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-01HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-01HouseReported with amendments (10-4-1).
2020-09-28HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback