LA HB148 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to supplemental pay for municipal or parish fire department employees (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to supplemental pay for municipal or parish fire department employees (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 148 To consider after the 57th calendar day (#1131) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#956) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 148 REENGROSS AND PASS TO THIRD READING (#1131) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 148 2/3 vote (#879) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Vote on HB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#636) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#956) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 148 REENGROSS AND PASS TO THIRD READING (#1131) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 148 2/3 vote (#879) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Vote on HB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#636) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2023. |
2023-06-13 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 298. |
2023-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day. |
2023-06-07 | House | By a vote of 101 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day. |
2023-06-07 | House | Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-24 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2023. |
2023-05-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-22 | House | Reported favorably (17-0). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2023-03-24 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/24/2023. |
2023-03-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2023-03-20 | House | Prefiled. |