LA HB148 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain educational institutions from state sales and use tax on the lease or rental of tangible personal property (EN -$200,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Exempts certain educational institutions from state sales and use tax on the lease or rental of tangible personal property (EN -$200,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#590) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#272) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#272) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-07-20 | House | Veto message read. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-06-29 | House | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-27 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-05 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021. |
2021-05-04 | House | Notice given. |
2021-05-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021. |
2021-04-29 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-03-19 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2021. |
2021-03-19 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-03-19 | House | Prefiled. |