LA HB148 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifies time period in which applicant for motorcycle insurance must provide proof to insurer of appropriate license endorsement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifies time period in which applicant for motorcycle insurance must provide proof to insurer of appropriate license endorsement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#557) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#224) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-05HouseEffective date: August 1, 2013.
2013-06-05HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 101.
2013-05-30HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2013-05-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2013-05-28HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2013-05-28HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2013-05-23SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2013-05-20SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2013-05-16SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2013-05-15SenateReported favorably.
2013-05-07SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2013-05-06SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2013-05-01HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2013-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/1/2013.
2013-04-25HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2013-04-24HouseReported favorably (9-0) (Regular).
2013-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2013-03-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2013.
2013-03-19HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2013-03-19HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=13rs&b=HB148&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=830017
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841326
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=843864
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=850807
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=856716
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=842627
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=830042
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841687
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=844118
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=860891
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=843830
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=850727

Bill Comments

feedback