LA HB146 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Effective date: 01/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes an income tax credit following the delivery of a stillborn child (EN -$726,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an income tax credit following the delivery of a stillborn child (EN -$726,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 146 CO-AUTHORS (#887) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 146 FINAL PASSAGE (#886) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 146 FINAL PASSAGE (#176) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29HouseEffective date: 01/01/2022.
2021-06-29HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 467.
2021-06-09HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-03SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-02SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-05SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2021-05-04SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-03HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-03HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2021.
2021-04-29HouseNotice given.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2021.
2021-04-27HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-26HouseReported favorably (16-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-03-19HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2021.
2021-03-18HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-03-18HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB146&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1204934
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217164
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232635
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236378
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1204940
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216941
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217436
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217796
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233909
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1238156
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220119
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232566
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232567

Bill Comments 750

feedback