LA HB146 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Hunters for the Hungry Louisiana" license plate
Title
Creates the "Hunters for the Hungry Louisiana" license plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 146 FINAL PASSAGE (#741) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House Vote on HB 146 FINAL PASSAGE (#10) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House Vote on HB 146 FINAL PASSAGE (#10) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2014. |
2014-05-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 29. |
2014-05-12 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-03-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-03-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/17/2014. |
2014-03-12 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2014-02-14 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/14/2014. |
2014-02-11 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2014-02-11 | House | Prefiled. |