LA HB146 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Effective date: June 17, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Effective date: June 17, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Seabrook Neighborhood Improvement and Security District in Orleans Parish (EN +$281,400 LF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Seabrook Neighborhood Improvement and Security District in Orleans Parish (EN +$281,400 LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 146, FINAL PASSAGE (#1239) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 146, FINAL PASSAGE (#399) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 146, FINAL PASSAGE (#399) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | Effective date: June 17, 2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 230. | |
2010-06-11 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-10 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-10 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-09 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-09 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-03 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-02 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-01 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-29 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2010-04-28 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-04-27 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 27, 2010. | |
2010-04-19 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2010-04-15 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2010-03-05 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2010. | |
2010-03-04 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2010-03-04 | Prefiled. |