LA HB145 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to parole (EN DECREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to parole (EN DECREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 145 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#927) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 145 FINAL PASSAGE (#596) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Vote on HB 145 FINAL PASSAGE (#126) (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-10HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 122.
2021-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-02HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-06-01HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/02/2021.
2021-05-27HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-05-27SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-20SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-19SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-18SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2021-04-29SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2021-04-28SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-04-28HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-28HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2021.
2021-04-27HouseNotice given.
2021-04-27HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-04-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2021.
2021-04-26HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-22HouseReported with amendments (9-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-03-18HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-03-18HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB145&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1204933
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216528
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230981
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234498
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215272
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216507
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1204939
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216207
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216723
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217020
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226656
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229540
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231892
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236998
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218572
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229296
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230898

Bill Comments

feedback