LA HB144 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Effective date: 06/04/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the mandatory age limitation for certain elected officials (EN NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the mandatory age limitation for certain elected officials (EN NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 144 FINAL PASSAGE (#299) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 144 FINAL PASSAGE (#106) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-04HouseEffective date: 06/04/2020.
2020-06-04HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 23.
2020-05-29HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-05-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-22HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-21HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-05-21SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-20SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-19SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2020-02-24HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020.
2020-02-24HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2020-02-24HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB144&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1158008
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170125
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175276
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180221
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1165581
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170071
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1158021
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164736
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170366
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170691
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175869
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172981
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175129

Bill Comments

feedback