LA HB144 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Effective date: May 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Effective date: May 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Corrects a reference in the Louisiana Securities Law
Title
Corrects a reference in the Louisiana Securities Law
Sponsors
Rep. Erich Ponti [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 144, FINAL PASSAGE (#713) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote on HB 144, FINAL PASSAGE (#52) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote on HB 144, FINAL PASSAGE (#52) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-11 | Effective date: May 11, 2012. | |
2012-05-11 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 52. | |
2012-05-08 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-05-07 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-07 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-02 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-30 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-26 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-25 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-03-27 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2012-03-26 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-03-26 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-03-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on 3/26/2012. | |
2012-03-20 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2012-03-19 | Reported favorably (17-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2012-02-17 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/17/2012. | |
2012-02-17 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2012-02-17 | Prefiled. |