LA HB141 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits certain public contracts with companies that boycott fossil fuel companies (OR NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Prohibits certain public contracts with companies that boycott fossil fuel companies (OR NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-02-25 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/25/2022. |
2022-02-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-02-23 | House | Prefiled. |