LA HB14 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-10 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-10 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to Schedule I of the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Law (EG SEE FISC NOTE See Note)
Title
Provides relative to Schedule I of the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Law (EG SEE FISC NOTE See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-05-10 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2023. |
2023-05-08 | House | Notice given. |
2023-05-08 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-05-08 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/2023. |
2023-05-02 | House | Notice given. |
2023-05-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-04-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2023. |
2023-04-26 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported favorably (8-7). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2023-02-17 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/17/2023. |
2023-02-06 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2023-02-06 | House | Prefiled. |