LA HB14 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) Authorizes the legislature to provide by law for the collection of sales and use taxes levied within the state (Item #27) (EG SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) Authorizes the legislature to provide by law for the collection of sales and use taxes levied within the state (Item #27) (EG SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-17HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-06-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/17/20.
2020-06-15HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-15HouseDischarged from the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-06-11HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-06-10HouseReported favorably (16-0).
2020-06-01HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback