LA HB139 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to fees for processing background check requests (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to fees for processing background check requests (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 139 FINAL PASSAGE (#786) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 139 FINAL PASSAGE (#362) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseEffective date: See Act.
2019-06-20HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 391.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-06-02SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended.
2019-05-30SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-29SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-28SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2019-05-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-15HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-15HouseRules suspended.
2019-05-14HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported with amendments (11-0-1).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB139&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117930
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130069
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141372
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144653
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129448
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129084
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129916
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130658
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117944
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130308
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130789
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142519
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145431
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134793
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141032

Bill Comments

feedback