LA HB1389 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to tax sales and adjudicated property (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV)
Title
Provides relative to tax sales and adjudicated property (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1389, FINAL PASSAGE (#1437) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1389, FINAL PASSAGE (#773) (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1389, FINAL PASSAGE (#773) (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-07-02 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 947. | |
2010-06-15 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-14 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-11 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-09 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-08 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-07 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-17 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2010-05-13 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-12 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 12, 2010. | |
2010-05-05 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-04 | Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title. |