LA HB138 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the use of video cameras in classrooms where special education services are provided to certain students with exceptionalities (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires the use of video cameras in classrooms where special education services are provided to certain students with exceptionalities (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-02-24 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020. |
2020-02-21 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-02-21 | House | Prefiled. |